VA SB1065 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0386)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0386)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local arts and cultural districts; tax incentives. Permits a locality to include the reduction or rebate of real estate property taxes among the tax incentives it makes available in an arts and cultural district established by ordinance. Current law provides for reductions in three other types of taxes or fees as examples of permissible incentives.
Title
Arts and cultural districts, local; tax incentives.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 6-N) (Y: 96 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 6-N) (Y: 96 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0386) | |
2013-03-14 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 386 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1065ER) |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-02-14 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-12 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 6-N) |
2013-02-12 | House | Passed House with amendment (94-Y 6-N) |
2013-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House as amended SB1065 |
2013-02-12 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2013-02-12 | House | Read third time |
2013-02-11 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-08 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2013-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (14-Y 1-N) |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102037D |