VA SB1068 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-22 - VOTE:DEFEATED (20-Y 80-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-22 - VOTE:DEFEATED (20-Y 80-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Defrauding certain entities; penalties. Provides Defrauding certain entities; penalties. Provides that it is a Class 1 misdemeanor for a person, without paying for, and with the intent to cheat or defraud the owner or keeper, to use a ski lift without a valid lift ticket or ski pass.
Title
Ski resorts; penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-22 - House - House: VOTE:DEFEATED (20-Y 80-N) (Y: 20 N: 80 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (18-Y 2-N) (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (18-Y 2-N) (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-22 | House | VOTE:DEFEATED (20-Y 80-N) |
2017-02-22 | House | Defeated by House (20-Y 80-N) |
2017-02-22 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-02-22 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-21 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-20 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (18-Y 2-N) |
2017-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1068S1 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17104311D-S1 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17104311D-S1 |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100551D |