VA SB1080 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-17 - Stricken from docket by Commerce and Labor by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-17 - Stricken from docket by Commerce and Labor by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
State Corporation System; secure online system. Reverses a measure enacted in the 2014 Session prohibiting the State Corporation Commission (SCC) from accepting through its eFile electronic registration system articles of dissolution of a business entity or data or documents that contain officer or director changes until the SCC has implemented a system, to be implemented by July 1, 2018, that ensures that such documents are capable of being submitted electronically only by a user designated to make such submissions on behalf of the business entity and whose identity has been established satisfactorily through a verification process. This measure permits such articles of dissolution and other data or documents to be filed electronically through the eFile system commencing July 1, 2015. This measure also removes the July 1, 2018, deadline and in its place directs the SCC to use diligent efforts to incorporate capabilities into the system that ensure that such articles, data, and documents are capable of being submitted by such a designated user whose identity has been verified.
Title
State Corporation Commission; secure online system.
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Vogel [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-17 | House | Stricken from docket by Commerce and Labor by voice vote |
2015-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2015-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101330D |