VA SB1105 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0160)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0160)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Office of Farmland Preservation; Virginia Farmland Preservation Fund created. Creates the Virginia Farmland Preservation Fund, to consist of funds as may be appropriated by the General Assembly and any other moneys that may be made available from other public or private sources. The funds will be used solely for the purposes of preserving farmland in the Commonwealth and will be administered by the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services.
Title
Virginia Farmland Preservation Fund; created.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-15 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0160) | |
2011-03-15 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 160 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-15 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-15 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1105ER) | |
2011-02-15 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-11 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-11 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-11 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-10 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-09 | House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-01-27 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-01-25 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-24 | Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101565D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1725 (Same As) 2011-03-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0095)