VA SB1129 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Eligibility for food stamps and TANF; drug-related felonies. Provides that a person who is otherwise eligible to receive food stamp benefits or Temporary Assistance for Needy Families shall not be denied such assistance solely because he has been convicted of any drug-related felony, provided that such person is complying with, or has already complied with, all obligations imposed by the criminal court, is actively engaged in or has completed a substance abuse treatment program, participates in periodic drug screenings, and fulfills any other obligations as determined by the Department of Social Services. Under current law, such individuals may not be denied food stamp benefits based on a felony conviction of possession of a controlled substance. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act.
Title
Food stamps and TANF; eligibility, drug-related felonies.
Sponsors
Sen. Mamie Locke [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (50-Y 45-N) (Y: 50 N: 45 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (12-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (12-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-02-13 | House | VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (50-Y 45-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Motion to refer to committee agreed to (50-Y 45-N) |
2019-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-11 | House | Committee substitute printed 19106678D-H1 |
2019-02-11 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 19105827D-ES1 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB1129ES1 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19105827D-S1 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19105827D-S1 |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (12-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2018-12-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2018-12-29 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102418D |