VA SB113 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0100)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0100)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Issuance of driver’s licenses to minors. Requires that a licensee who is under the age of 18 at the time that the ceremony is held to issue an original driver’s license be accompanied by a parent, guardian, spouse, or other person in loco parentis. Under current law, a licensee must be accompanied at the ceremony if he is under the age of 18 at the time the application for licensure is made. This bill is a recommendation of the Committee on District Courts.
Title
Driver's licenses; minors to be accompanied by parent, guardian, etc., to ceremony.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0100) | |
2012-03-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 100 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-02-22 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-02-22 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-02-22 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB113ER) | |
2012-02-22 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2012-02-20 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-20 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-20 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-20 | House: Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House | |
2012-02-20 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-20 | House: Read third time | |
2012-02-17 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-16 | House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-01-24 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-01-20 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-18 | Senate: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-01-09 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100582D |
Same As/Similar To
HB647 (Same As) 2012-02-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0030)