VA SB1139 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0065)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0065)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Post-adoption contact and communication agreements. Provides that a local board of social services or child welfare agency required to file a petition for a permanency planning hearing may inform the birth parents and shall inform the adoptive parents that they may enter into enter into a post-adoption contact and communication agreement. The bill further provides that such local board of social services or child welfare agency shall inform the child if he is 14 years of age or older that he may consent to such an agreement. This bill is identical to HB 1728.
Title
Post-adoption contact & communication agreements; authority to enter into agreements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0065) | |
2019-02-19 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 65 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-14 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 21, 2019 | |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 14, 2019 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1139ER) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-11 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-08 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-06 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-29 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1139S1 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19105184D-S1 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19105184D-S1 |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-12-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-12-30 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103550D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 283.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1220.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1220.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |