VA SB1145 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Riparian planting grounds lease; eligibility. Reduces from 205 feet to 105 feet the minimum low-water shore front that makes the landowner eligible to apply for riparian planting grounds assignment by the Commissioner of the Marine Resources Commission. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act.
Title
Riparian planting grounds lease; eligibility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-02-08 | House | Committee substitute printed 17105271D-H1 |
2017-02-08 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2017-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 17101396D-E |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1145E |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101396D |
Subjects
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Fisheries and Habitat of the Tidal Waters
Marine Products Science and Resources
Riparian Rights
Waters of the State Ports and Harbors
Fisheries and Habitat of the Tidal Waters
Marine Products Science and Resources
Riparian Rights
Waters of the State Ports and Harbors