VA SB1167 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0444)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Medicaid recipients; treatment involving opioids or opioid replacements; payment. Prohibits health care providers licensed by the Board of Medicine from requesting or requiring a patient who is a recipient of medical assistance services pursuant to the state plan for medical assistance to pay out-of-pocket costs associated with the provision of service involving (i) the prescription of an opioid for the management of pain or (ii) the prescription of buprenorphine-containing products, methadone, or other opioid replacements approved for the treatment of opioid addiction by the U.S. Food and Drug Administration for medication-assisted treatment of opioid addiction. The bill requires providers who do not accept payment from the Department of Medical Assistance Services (DMAS) who provide such services to patients participating in the Commonwealth's program of medical assistance services to provide written notice to such patient that (a) the Commonwealth's program of medical assistance services covers such health care services and DMAS will pay for such health care services if such health care services meet DMAS's medical necessity criteria and (b) the provider does not participate in the Commonwealth's program of medical assistance and will not accept payment from DMAS for such health care services. Such notice and the patient's acknowledgement of such notice shall be documented in the patient's medical record. This bill is identical to HB 2558.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medicaid recipients; treatment involving opioids or opioid replacements, payment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0444)
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 444 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-20SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 20, 2019
2019-02-19SenateSigned by President
2019-02-18HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-18SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1167ER)
2019-02-18SenateEnrolled
2019-02-13SenateTitle replaced 19106315D-H1
2019-02-13SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1167H1
2019-02-11HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106315D-H1
2019-02-11HouseRead third time
2019-02-08HouseRead second time
2019-02-07HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106315D-H1
2019-02-07HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2019-01-24HouseRead first time
2019-01-24HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-22SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-21SenatePrinted as engrossed 19102202D-E
2019-01-21SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1167E
2019-01-21SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-01-21SenateReading of amendments waived
2019-01-21SenateRead second time
2019-01-18SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2019-01-17SenateReported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-11SenateAssigned Education sub: Health Professions
2019-01-03SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-01-03SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102202D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5412910.3:1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1167
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1167+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1167E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1167H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1167ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0444+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0046+SB1167
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0087SB1167+SB1167
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0122SB1167+SB1167
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H12V0124+SB1167
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2596+SB1167
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0566SB1167+SB1167

Bill Comments

feedback