VA SB1171 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0157)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0157)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public schools; early intervention services for reading and mathematics. Adds kindergarten and grades one and two to the requirement that local school divisions provide early intervention services to students in grade three who demonstrate deficiencies based on their individual performance on diagnostic reading tests. The bill requires local school divisions to provide algebra readiness intervention services to students in grades six through nine who are at risk of failing the Algebra I end-of-course test as demonstrated by their individual performance on diagnostic tests.
Title
Public schools; reading intervention services for students in kindergarten through grade 3, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-12 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0157) | |
2013-03-12 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 157 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1171ER) |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-02-13 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-13 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2013-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-11 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2013-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1171S1 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 13104330D-S1 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Read second time |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Substitute bill reprinted 13104330D-S1 |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 13104330D-S1 |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (12-Y 3-N) |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13103538D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2068 (Same As) 2013-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0123)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1 | 253.13:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 253.13:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |