VA SB1171 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0622)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Alcoholic beverage control; local special events license. Creates a local special events license, which allows a locality, business improvement district, or nonprofit organization to permit the consumption of alcoholic beverages within the area designated by the Board of Directors of the Virginia Alcoholic Beverage Control Authority for a special event, provided that such alcoholic beverages are purchased from a permanent retail on-premises licensee located within such designated area and are contained in disposable containers that clearly display the selling licensee's name or logo. The bill limits local special events licensees to 12 events per year and provides that the area designated for the special event may include sidewalks and the premises of businesses not licensed to sell alcoholic beverages, upon approval of such businesses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverage control; creates local special events license.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 6-N) (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (18-Y 1-N) (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 2-N) (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0622)
2019-03-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 622 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-20SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 20, 2019
2019-02-19SenateSigned by President
2019-02-18HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-18SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1171ER)
2019-02-18SenateEnrolled
2019-02-13HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 6-N)
2019-02-13HousePassed House (91-Y 6-N)
2019-02-13HouseRead third time
2019-02-12HouseRead second time
2019-02-12HouseReported from General Laws (18-Y 1-N)
2019-02-12HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2019-02-07HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2019-02-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-04SenateRead third time and passed Senate (37-Y 3-N)
2019-02-01SenatePrinted as engrossed 19100724D-E
2019-02-01SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1171E
2019-02-01SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-01SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-02-01SenateRead second time
2019-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30SenateReported from Finance (14-Y 2-N)
2019-01-18SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-01-18SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (13-Y 1-N)
2019-01-03SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2019-01-03SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100724D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41206(n/a)See Bill Text
41231(n/a)See Bill Text
41233(n/a)See Bill Text
41308(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1171
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1171+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1171E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1171ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0622+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S09V0020+SB1171
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0168+SB1171
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0268SB1171+SB1171
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0326SB1171+SB1171
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1103V0025+SB1171
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H11V0244+SB1171
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1103V0034+SB1171
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2761+SB1171

Bill Comments

feedback