VA SB1177 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Failed to report (defeated) in Commerce and Labor (11-Y 11-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Failed to report (defeated) in Commerce and Labor (11-Y 11-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Health Club Act; automated external defibrillator required in health clubs. Requires each health club location to have a working automated external defibrillator, which is defined in the bill.
Title
Virginia Health Club Act; automated external defibrillator required in health clubs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - House - House: Failed to report (defeated) in Commerce and Labor (11-Y 11-N) (Y: 11 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (30-Y 10-N) (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (7-Y 6-N) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (30-Y 10-N) (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (7-Y 6-N) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | House | Failed to report (defeated) in Commerce and Labor (11-Y 11-N) |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (30-Y 10-N) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (7-Y 6-N) |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103255D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 1 | 296 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 296.2:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |