VA SB1178 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0812)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0812)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Prescription of buprenorphine without naloxone; limitation. Provides that prescriptions for products containing buprenorphine without naloxone shall be issued only (i) for patients who are pregnant, (ii) when converting a patient from methadone to buprenorphine containing naloxone for a period not to exceed seven days, or (iii) as permitted by regulations of the Board of Medicine or the Board of Nursing. The bill contains an emergency clause and has an expiration date of July 1, 2022. This bill is identical to HB 2163.
Title
Buprenorphine without naloxone; prescription limitation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0812) | |
2017-04-05 | House | Enacted, Chapter 812 (effective 7/1/17) |
2017-04-05 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB1178ER2) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Reenrolled |
2017-04-05 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2017-04-05 | Governor: Emergency clause deleted by Governor's recommendation | |
2017-04-05 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-04-05 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2017-02-23 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/23/17 |
2017-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1178ER) |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Title replaced 17105311D-H1 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | House | Emergency clause added |
2017-02-16 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1178H1 |
2017-02-16 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17105311D-H1 |
2017-02-16 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-15 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-14 | House | Committee substitute printed 17105311D-H1 |
2017-02-14 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2017-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 17101156D-E |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1178E |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101156D |