VA SB1188 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-18 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-18 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Career Pathways System Advisory Council; established. Establishes the Career Pathways System Advisory Council. The purpose of the Council is to ensure the coordination and collaboration of career and technical education, adult education, and workforce development programs through business-driven sector strategies that provide for sequences of education and training articulated with higher levels of education and regional and state workforce needs and that also provide career coaching and advising support services and experiential learning. The Council will develop workforce readiness indicators, in coordination with the Virginia Workforce Council and the Council on Virginia's Future, which will include enrollment and graduation statistics in secondary, postsecondary, and adult education programs in science, technology, engineering, math, or health care-related areas; numbers of targeted industry certifications; and the Commonwealth's education and training capacity for key industry sectors, and will produce a scorecard documenting progress in these areas. The scorecard will also include a report on the progress of interagency collaboration and shared funding for the purposes of attaining select education and workforce development goals. The bill includes a sunset provision of July 1, 2016. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act.
Title
Career Pathways System Advisory Council; established, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Bills placed in block (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Bills placed in block (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-18 | House | Left in Education |
2013-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2013-02-08 | House | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education and Arts |
2013-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2013-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Bills placed in block (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 13103535D-E |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1188E |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Read second time |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13103535D |