VA SB1201 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0753)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0753)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Stormwater; municipal separate storm sewer system permittees; dredging. Directs the State Water Control Board (the Board) to establish a procedure for the approval of dredging operations in the Chesapeake Bay watershed as a method by which to meet pollutant reduction and loading requirements. The bill provides that before the Board is required to establish the procedure, the Chesapeake Bay Program shall first approve the procedure as a creditable practice for pollutant removal. The bill requires that any dredging comply with all applicable laws. The bill also provides that any locality imposing certain stormwater fees may make funds available for stormwater maintenance dredging, including at the point of discharge, where stormwater has contributed to the deposition of sediment in state waters.
Title
Stormwater; procedure for approval of dredging operations in the Chesapeake Bay Watershed.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 38-N 1-A) (Y: 0 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 1-N) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 38-N 1-A) (Y: 0 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 1-N) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0753) | |
2015-04-15 | House | Enacted, Chapter 753 (effective 7/1/15) |
2015-04-15 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB1201ER2) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2015-04-15 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (94-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1201ER) |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-26 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2015-02-26 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (91-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Conference substitute printed 15105642D-S2 |
2015-02-26 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2015-02-26 | House | Delegates: Knight, DeSteph, James |
2015-02-26 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senators: Wagner, Ruff, Lewis |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-25 | House | House requested conference committee |
2015-02-25 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2015-02-24 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 38-N 1-A) |
2015-02-20 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2015-02-20 | House | Passed House with substitute (95-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2015-02-20 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1201H1 |
2015-02-20 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15105208D-H1 |
2015-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-18 | House | Committee substitute printed 15105208D-H1 |
2015-02-18 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Assigned ACNRsub: Chesapeake |
2015-02-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2015-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1201S1 |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15104465D-S1 |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15104465D-S1 |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100954D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
62 | 1 | 44.15:28.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |