VA SB1221 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0097)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0097)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Emergency custody or involuntary admission process; alternative transportation model. Directs the Commissioner of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services and the Director of Criminal Justice Services, in conjunction with the relevant stakeholders, to develop a comprehensive model for the use of alternative transportation providers to provide safe and efficient transportation of individuals involved in the emergency custody or involuntary admission process as an alternative to transportation by law enforcement. The bill requires that the model be completed by October 1, 2017, and reported to the Joint Subcommittee to Study Mental Health Services in the Commonwealth in the 21st Century, the House Committee for Courts of Justice, and the Senate Committee for Courts of Justice. This bill is identical to HB 1426.
Title
Emergency custody or involuntary admission process; alternative transportation model.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0097) | |
2017-02-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 97 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-15 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 22, 2017 | |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/15/17 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1221ER) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-13 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-09 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2017-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 17101684D-E |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1221E |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101684D |
Subjects
Behavioral Health and Developmental Services
Criminal Justice Services
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Uncodified Legislation
Criminal Justice Services
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Uncodified Legislation