VA SB1233 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-22 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-22 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Law Officers' Retirement System; membership. Adds conservation officers of the Department of Conservation and Recreation as members of the Virginia Law Officers' Retirement System. Conservation Officers would accrue retirement benefits under the Virginia Law Officers' Retirement System only for creditable service on or after July 1, 2011.
Title
Virginia Law Officers' Retirement System; adds certain conservation officers as members.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 7-N) (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-22 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2011-02-17 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2011-02-15 | House: Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement | |
2011-02-08 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-02-08 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-08 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-04 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 7-N) | |
2011-02-03 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1233S1 | |
2011-02-03 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 11104858D-S1 | |
2011-02-03 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2011-02-03 | Senate: Read second time | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 11104858D-S1 | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (11-Y 3-N) | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102704D |