VA SB1244 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Practice of chiropractic; scope. Expands the scope of practice of chiropractic to include performing the physical examinations required of applicants for a new commercial driver's license or commercial driver's learner's permit or a renewal of such license or permit.
Title
Chiropractors; expands scope of practice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-24 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2015-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-02-13 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2015-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-11 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 15103277D-E |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1244E |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendment (12-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103277D |