VA SB125 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-10 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-10 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Line of Duty Act. Allows a political subdivision with employees eligible for coverage under the Line of Duty Act to make an irrevocable election, on or before July 1, 2013, to self-fund the benefits available under the Line of Duty Act. The bill contains a reenactment clause.
Title
Line of Duty Act; political subdivision, etc., irrevocable election to self-fund benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 6-N) (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (8-Y 6-N 1-A) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (8-Y 6-N 1-A) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-10 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2012-02-17 | House: Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement | |
2012-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-01-31 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 6-N) | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2012-01-27 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 12103521D-E | |
2012-01-27 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB125E | |
2012-01-27 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2012-01-27 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2012-01-27 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-01-26 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2012-01-25 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-24 | Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (8-Y 6-N 1-A) | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103521D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
9 | 1 | 400 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 404 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 405 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |