VA SB1253 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0159)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0159)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Certain student assessment results; availability. Requires each school board to provide teachers, parents, principals, and other school leaders with their students' results on any Standards of Learning assessment or Virginia Alternate Assessment Program assessment as soon as practicable after the assessment is administered.
Title
Student assessment results; availability to teachers, parents, principals, and other school leaders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0159) | |
2023-03-22 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 159 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-02-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 27, 2023 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1253ER) |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Enrolled |
2023-02-13 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-13 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2023-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-08 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2023-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101178D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2225 (Same As) 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0158)
HB2225 (Same As) 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0158)
HB2225 (Same As) 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0158)