VA SB1262 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0676)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0676)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Fraud Against Taxpayers Act. Provides that a designee of the Attorney General may issue civil investigative demands. The bill also provides that information obtained by the Attorney General or his designee pursuant to the issuance of a civil investigative demand may be shared with any qui tam relator if the Attorney General or his designee determines that such information is necessary as part of any false claims investigation. In addition, the bill changes the elements of offenses that make persons liable to the Commonwealth under the Act. Under current law, a person is civilly liable to the Commonwealth if he (i) knowingly presents to an officer or employee of the Commonwealth a false or fraudulent claim for payment or approval; (ii) knowingly makes a false record to get a false or fraudulent claim paid or approved by the Commonwealth; (iii) has possession of property used by the Commonwealth and, intending to defraud the Commonwealth, knowingly delivers less property than the amount for which the person receives a certificate or receipt; or (iv) conspires to do any act described in clauses (i) through (iii). Under the bill, a person is civilly liable to the Commonwealth if he, respectively, (a) knowingly presents a false or fraudulent claim for payment or approval (regardless of to whom the claim is made); (b) knowingly makes a false record material to a false or fraudulent claim (regardless of whether the claim was paid or approved by the Commonwealth); (c) has possession of property used by the Commonwealth and delivers less than all such money or property (regardless of whether the person intends to defraud the Commonwealth); or (d) conspires to do any act described in clauses (a) through (c).
Title
Va. Fraud Against Taxpayers Act; designee of Attorney General may issue civil investigative demands.
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Vogel [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 14-N) (Y: 87 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 14-N) (Y: 87 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0676) | |
2011-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 676 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1262ER) | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-24 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 14-N) | |
2011-02-24 | House: Passed House with amendments (85-Y 14-N) | |
2011-02-24 | House: Engrossed by House as amended | |
2011-02-24 | House: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2011-02-24 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-23 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-21 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-14 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #2 Civil | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-03 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 11102826D-E | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1262E | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Read second time | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-18 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102826D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
8 | 01 | 216.10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 216.17 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 216.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 216.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 216.8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 216.9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |