VA SB1268 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0529)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0529)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Adoption; child in custody of prospective adoptive parent(s) for five years or more. Allows the juvenile and domestic relations district court to accept consent to a parental placement adoption without a home study and certain meeting and counseling requirements if the child has been in the continuous legal and physical custody of the prospective adoptive parent(s) for five or more years.
Title
Adoption; child in custody of prospective adoptive parent(s) for five years or more.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (29-Y 9-N) (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (8-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (29-Y 9-N) (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (8-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0529) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 529 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/26/15 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1268ER) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-19 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | House | Passed House (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-18 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-17 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (20-Y 2-N) |
2015-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2015-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (29-Y 9-N) |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1268S1 |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15104856D-S1 |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15104856D-S1 |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (8-Y 3-N 1-A) |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102615D |