VA SB1294 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-23 - Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-23 - Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Senate districts; technical adjustment. Reassigns the Fairways Precinct in the City of Chesapeake from District 5 to District 14.
Title
Senate Districts; technical adjustments in boundaries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House substitute with amendment rejected by Senate (19-Y 20-N) (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House substitute with amendment agreed to by Senate (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House substitute with amendment rejected by Senate (19-Y 20-N) (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (60-Y 31-N 1-A) (Y: 62 N: 31 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (65-Y 32-N) (Y: 67 N: 32 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 4-N 2-A) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Privileges and Elections (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House substitute with amendment rejected by Senate (19-Y 20-N) (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House substitute with amendment agreed to by Senate (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House substitute with amendment rejected by Senate (19-Y 20-N) (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (60-Y 31-N 1-A) (Y: 62 N: 31 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (65-Y 32-N) (Y: 67 N: 32 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 4-N 2-A) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Privileges and Elections (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-23 | Senate | Failed to pass in Senate |
2013-02-23 | Senate | No further action taken |
2013-02-21 | House | Delegates: Cosgrove, Cole, Hester |
2013-02-21 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senators: Blevins, Smith, McDougle |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (38-Y 1-N) |
2013-02-21 | House | House requested conference committee |
2013-02-21 | House | House insisted on substitute with amendment |
2013-02-21 | Senate | House substitute with amendment rejected by Senate (19-Y 20-N) |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Reconsideration of House substitute with amendment agreed to by Senate (37-Y 1-N) |
2013-02-21 | Senate | House substitute with amendment rejected by Senate (19-Y 20-N) |
2013-02-21 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (60-Y 31-N 1-A) |
2013-02-21 | House | Passed House with substitute with amendment (60-Y 31-N 1-A) |
2013-02-21 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment SB1294H1 |
2013-02-21 | House | No action taken on Delegate Toscano's Amendments |
2013-02-21 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (65-Y 32-N) |
2013-02-21 | House | Amendment by Delegate Bell, R.B. agreed to (65-Y 32-N) |
2013-02-21 | House | Passed by until the end of the calendar |
2013-02-21 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 13105086D-H1 |
2013-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2013-02-20 | House | Passed by for the day |
2013-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-18 | House | Committee substitute printed 13105086D-H1 |
2013-02-18 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (13-Y 9-N) |
2013-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-11 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Elections Subcommittee |
2013-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2013-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-11 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (24-Y 16-N) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 4-N 2-A) |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Reconsidered by Privileges and Elections |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Privileges and Elections (8-Y 7-N) |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 13103838D |