VA SB1306 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Industrial hemp; license. Requires the Commissioner of Agriculture and Consumer Services to create a pilot program for the growing of industrial hemp with certain application, review, and operation requirements. The bill provides that hemp produced by the research program may be sold as part of marketing research.
Title
Industrial hemp; license to grow outside of research program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-02-15 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Agriculture |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2017-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1306S1 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17104470D-S1 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17104470D-S1 |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103801D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 2 | 4112 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 4115 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 4116 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 4117 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |