VA SB1307 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0501)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0501)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Search warrants; computers, networks, and other electronic devices. Clarifies that a search warrant that authorizes the lawful seizure of digital evidence from a computer, computer network, or other device containing electronic or digital information includes the search and seizure of the physical components and the electronic or digital information contained in such computer, computer network, or other device. The bill also provides that any search, including the search of any computer, computer network, or other device, may be conducted in any location and not just the location where the evidence was seized. The bill provides that its provisions are declaratory of existing law.
Title
Search warrants; collection of evidence from computers, computer networks, or other device.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0501) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 501 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1307ER) |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Title replaced 15105316D-H1 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1307H1 |
2015-02-24 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15105316D-H1 |
2015-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-23 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-20 | House | Committee substitute printed 15105316D-H1 |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-11 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101869D |