VA SB1334 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0586)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0586)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Military laws of Virginia. Makes several amendments to the military laws of the Commonwealth. Many of the changes are technical, such as updating references to the Virginia State Guard and Virginia State Defense Force to the Virginia Defense Force and deleting obsolete references. The bill also makes amendments to the appointment of officers of the National Guard and special courts-martial. The bill is identical to HB 1852.
Title
State military laws; several technical changes and amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0586) | |
2011-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 586 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-18 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1334ER) | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-15 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-15 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-15 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-14 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-11 | House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (20-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1334S1 | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 11104131D-S1 | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Read second time | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-28 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 11104131D-S1 | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103767D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 2666.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 743 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
65 | 2 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
65 | 2 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 400 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |