VA SB1339 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0483)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0483)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Minimum staffing standards for certified nursing facilities; administrative sanctions. Sets nursing staffing requirements for certified nursing facilities, imposes administrative sanctions on a certified nursing facility if it does not comply with the staffing requirements, provides for exemptions to the administrative sanctions under certain circumstances, and directs the promulgation of regulations consistent with the bill. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2025.
Title
Certified nursing facilities; minimum staffing standards, administrative sanctions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0483) | |
2023-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 483 (effective - see bill) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1339ER) |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2023-02-17 | House | VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-17 | House | Passed House (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-17 | House | Read third time |
2023-02-16 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-14 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (20-Y 1-N) |
2023-02-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2023-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-10 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1339S1 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 23105304D-S1 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 23105304D-S1 |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101878D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1446 (Same As) 2023-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0482)
HB1446 (Same As) 2023-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0482)
HB1446 (Same As) 2023-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0482)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1 | 127 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 27.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 27.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |