VA SB1347 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-22 - House: Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-22 - House: Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Racing Commission; simulcast horse racing; allocations. Authorizes wagering on historical horse racing. The bill also allocates the proceeds from such racing with forty-two percent of the proceeds distributed to the Commonwealth Transportation Trust Fund and the remaining fifty-eight percent distributed to other entities. In addition, the bill (i) requires the existing race track to provide gambling educational programs including information on the availability of gambling addiction counseling and (ii) requires the promulgation of emergency regulations. The bill incorporates
Title
Virginia Racing Commission; authorizes wagering on horse historical racing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (9-Y 4-N 1-A) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (9-Y 4-N 1-A) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-22 | House: Left in General Laws | |
2011-02-17 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2011-02-14 | House: Assigned GL sub: #3 ABC/Gaming | |
2011-02-09 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2011-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-09 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) | |
2011-02-04 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 11104751D-ES1 | |
2011-02-04 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB1347ES1 | |
2011-02-04 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2011-02-04 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2011-02-04 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 11104751D-S1 | |
2011-02-04 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2011-02-04 | Senate: Read second time | |
2011-02-03 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (9-Y 4-N 1-A) | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Incorporates SB1438 | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 11104751D-S1 | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (9-Y 5-N) | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101507D |
Subjects
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Sporting Exhibitions, Events, and Facilities
Trade and Commerce
Sporting Exhibitions, Events, and Facilities
Trade and Commerce
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 1 | 365 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 369 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 392 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |