VA SB1349 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-08 - Senate: Stricken from Senate calendar (40-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-08 - Senate: Stricken from Senate calendar (40-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Small Business Financing Authority; definitions; eligible business. Removes from the definition of "eligible business" a nonprofit entity granted tax-exempt status under 501(c) (3) of the Internal Revenue Code.
Title
Small Business Financing Authority; definition of eligible business.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Stricken from Senate calendar (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | Senate: Stricken from Senate calendar (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1349S1 | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 11104690D-S1 | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Read second time | |
2011-02-04 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2011-02-03 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 11104690D-S1 | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102615D |