VA SB1369 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0715)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0715)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Electronic filing in civil or criminal proceedings. Clarifies that clerks may provide official certificates and certified records in digital form of any document maintained by the clerk. The bill also confirms the clerks' authority to perform notarial acts. The bill also makes various changes to clerks' duties regarding electronic filing.
Title
Clerks; may provide official certificates and certified records in digital form, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0715) | |
2011-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 715 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1369ER) | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-24 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-24 | House: Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-24 | House: Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House | |
2011-02-24 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-24 | House: Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-24 | House: Engrossed by House as amended | |
2011-02-24 | House: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2011-02-24 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-23 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-21 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (21-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-11 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-10 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal | |
2011-02-09 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-09 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-04 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1369S1 | |
2011-02-04 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 11104590D-S1 | |
2011-02-04 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2011-02-04 | Senate: Read second time | |
2011-02-03 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 11104590D-S1 | |
2011-01-18 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103744D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 1 | 258.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 258.3:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 293 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 294 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 502 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |