VA SB1375 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0865)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0865)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Board for Contractors; regulation of building analysts. Provides for the licensure of residential building energy analysts by the Board for Contractors. The bill defines residential building energy analysis.
Title
Contractors, Board for; regulation of building analysts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (75-Y 23-N) (Y: 75 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (57-Y 38-N) (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (14-Y 4-N) (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (57-Y 38-N) (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (14-Y 4-N) (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0865) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Enacted, Chapter 865 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Reenrolled bill text (SB1375ER2) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2011-04-06 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (75-Y 23-N) | |
2011-04-06 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (75-Y 23-N) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-05 | Senate: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-03-26 | Senate: Governor's recommendation received by Senate | |
2011-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1375ER) | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Title replaced 11105376D-H1 | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (57-Y 38-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Passed House with substitute (57-Y 38-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1375H1 | |
2011-02-22 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11105376D-H1 | |
2011-02-22 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-21 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-17 | House: Committee substitute printed 11105376D-H1 | |
2011-02-17 | House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (14-Y 4-N) | |
2011-02-15 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 2-N) | |
2011-02-11 | House: Assigned GL sub: #4 Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process | |
2011-02-10 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2011-02-10 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-10 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1375S1 | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 11104666D-S1 | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Read second time | |
2011-02-04 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 11104666D-S1 | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2011-01-13 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 11103211D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 300 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 500 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 500.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 516 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 517.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 517.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |