VA SB1386 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0125)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

James Madison University; management agreement. Provides a management agreement between the Commonwealth and James Madison University pursuant to the Restructured Higher Education Financial and Administrative Operations Act (?§23.1-1000 et seq.). This bill is identical to HB 2290.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

James Madison University; management agreement with the Commonwealth.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0125)
2019-02-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 125 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-14 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 21, 2019
2019-02-14SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 14, 2019
2019-02-14SenateSigned by President
2019-02-13HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-13SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1386ER)
2019-02-13HouseEnrolled
2019-02-11HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11HouseRead third time
2019-02-08HouseRead second time
2019-02-06HouseReported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseAssigned App. sub: Higher Education
2019-01-30HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-30HouseRead first time
2019-01-30HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-28SenateRead third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25SenateRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-24SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23SenateReported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102031D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2311000(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback