VA SB1388 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Trespassing on railroad trains; penalty. Raises the penalty for trespassing on a railroad car or train from a Class 4 to a Class 2 misdemeanor.
Title
Railroad trains; trespassing, raises penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (20-Y 16-N) (Y: 20 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (7-Y 6-N) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (7-Y 6-N) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-24 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2015-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-02-09 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2015-02-09 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (20-Y 16-N) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (7-Y 6-N) |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 15103566D |