VA SB1398 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0817)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0817)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Coal combustion residuals unit; closure permit; assessments required. Requires the owner or operator of a coal combustion residuals unit (CCR unit) to identify water pollution and address corrective measures to resolve it, evaluate the clean closure of the CCR unit by recycling the ash for use in cement or moving it to a landfill, and demonstrate the long-term safety of the CCR unit. The bill requires the owner or operator of each CCR unit to transmit its assessment to the Department of Environmental Quality (DEQ) and other agencies or legislative committees by December 1, 2017. The bill requires the Director of DEQ to delay the issuance of a permit to close any CCR unit until May 1, 2018, or the effective date of any legislation adopted during the 2018 Regular Session of the General Assembly that addresses the closure of CCR units, whichever occurs later.
Title
Coal combustion residuals unit; closure permit, assessments required.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (92-Y 3-N 2-A) (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 2-N) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 1-N 2-A) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 2-N) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 1-N 2-A) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0817) | |
2017-04-05 | House | Enacted, Chapter 817 (effective - see bill) |
2017-04-05 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB1398ER2) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Reenrolled |
2017-04-05 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2017-04-05 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (92-Y 3-N 2-A) |
2017-04-05 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (92-Y 3-N 2-A) |
2017-04-05 | House | Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to |
2017-04-05 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 2-N) |
2017-04-05 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (96-Y 2-N) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (37-Y 3-N) |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2017-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/28/17 |
2017-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1398ER) |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Title replaced 17105506D-H1 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N) |
2017-02-17 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 1-N 2-A) |
2017-02-17 | House | Passed House with substitute (96-Y 1-N 2-A) |
2017-02-17 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1398H1 |
2017-02-17 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17105506D-H1 |
2017-02-17 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-16 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-15 | House | Committee substitute printed 17105506D-H1 |
2017-02-15 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-09 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Agriculture |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2017-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1398S1 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17104685D-S1 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17104685D-S1 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (9-Y 5-N) |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103805D |