VA SB143 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-14 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-14 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Income tax; Renewable Energy Job Creation tax credit. Provides for a grant to be paid from newly created Green Jobs Grant Program Fund to corporations for each "Renewable Energy Job" created and filled. The amount of the grant for each such job is $500 for each salary of $50,000 and more a year and may be taken for four years. A Renewable Energy Job is employment in an industry related to renewable alternative energies. The credit is available for taxable years beginning on or after January 1, 2010, but before January 1, 2015. All grants under this section shall be subject to the appropriation of moneys by the General Assembly to the Fund for payment of the grants.
Title
Green Jobs Grant Program; established.
Sponsors
Sen. John Miller [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-14 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2010-02-26 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2010-02-23 | House: Assigned App. sub: Economic Development, Agriculture and Natural Resources | |
2010-02-18 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-02-18 | House: Referred from Commerce and Labor by voice vote | |
2010-02-16 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2010-02-16 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-16 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-12 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB143S1 | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 10105241D-S1 | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-09 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 10105241D-S1 | |
2010-02-09 | Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2010-01-11 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101959D |