VA SB144 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-01-28 - Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (SB246-Howell) (13-Y 0-N)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-01-28 - Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (SB246-Howell) (13-Y 0-N)
Summary
Involuntary commitment; criteria. Changes the criteria for emergency custody orders, temporary detention orders, and involuntary commitment so that a person may be taken into emergency custody, placed under temporary detention, or involuntarily committed where it is found that (i) the person has a mental illness, and (ii) there exists a substantial likelihood that, as a result of that mental illness, the person will, in the near future, (a) cause serious physical harm to himself or others as evidenced by recent behavior causing, attempting, or threatening harm, or (b) suffer serious harm due to substantial deterioration of his capacity to protect himself from harm or to provide for his basic human needs. This bill has been incorporated into
Title
Emergency custody orders, temporary detention orders, and involuntary commitment; criteria.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-01-28 | Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (SB246-Howell) (13-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-21 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Special on Proposed Mental Health Legislation | |
2008-01-04 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-04 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 083171228 |
Same As/Similar To
SB246 (Similar To) 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0788)
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Mental Health, Mental Retardation, and Substance Abuse Services
Prisons and Other Methods of Correction
Mental Health, Mental Retardation, and Substance Abuse Services
Prisons and Other Methods of Correction
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB144 |