VA SB16 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0571)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0571)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Search warrants, subpoenas, court orders, or other process; menstrual health data prohibited. Prohibits the issuance of a search warrant, subpoena, court order, or other process for the purpose of the search and seizure or production of menstrual health data, as defined in the bill, including data stored on a computer, computer network, or other device containing electronic or digital information.
Title
Search warrants, subpoenas, court orders, or other process; menstrual health data prohibited.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (51-Y 49-N) (Y: 51 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-11 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (51-Y 49-N) (Y: 51 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-11 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0571) | |
2024-04-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 571 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House reprinted (SB16ER) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB16ER) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-02-23 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (22-Y 17-N) |
2024-02-21 | House | VOTE: Passage (51-Y 49-N) |
2024-02-21 | House | Passed House with amendment (51-Y 49-N) |
2024-02-21 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2024-02-21 | House | Amendment by Delegate Watts agreed to |
2024-02-21 | House | Committee substitute rejected 24107823D-H1 |
2024-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-16 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 10-N) |
2024-02-16 | House | Committee substitute printed 24107823D-H1 |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-02-15 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB16S1 |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 24106050D-S1 |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24106050D-S1 |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (9-Y 6-N) |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Rereferred to Courts of Justice |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Rereferred from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-11-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2023-11-27 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24100007D |
Same As/Similar To
HB78 (Similar To) 2024-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0523)
HB1359 (Similar To) 2024-02-09 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
HB1359 (Similar To) 2024-02-09 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice