VA SB1619 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0732)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Spoliation of evidence. Establishes that a party or potential litigant has a duty to preserve evidence that may be relevant to reasonably foreseeable litigation. The bill further provides that a court (i) upon finding prejudice to another party from loss, disposal, alteration, concealment, or destruction of such evidence, may order measures no greater than necessary to cure the prejudice, or (ii) only upon finding that the party acted recklessly or with the intent to deprive another party of the evidence's use in the litigation, may (a) presume that the evidence was unfavorable to the party, (b) instruct the jury that it may or shall presume that the evidence was unfavorable to the party, or (c) dismiss the action or enter a default judgment. The bill further provides that no independent cause of action for negligent or intentional spoliation of evidence is created.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Evidence; establishes that a party or potential litigant has a duty to preserve.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House amendment rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N) (Y: 1 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0732)
2019-03-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 732 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-11SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019
2019-03-09SenateSigned by President
2019-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-07SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1619ER)
2019-03-07SenateEnrolled
2019-02-23SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-23HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
2019-02-23HouseConference report agreed to by House (95-Y 0-N)
2019-02-23SenateConference substitute printed 19107523D-S1
2019-02-23 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2019-02-21HouseDelegates: Leftwich, Campbell, J.L., Bourne
2019-02-21HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-21SenateSenators: Obenshain, Petersen, Stuart
2019-02-21SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-21SenateSenate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21HouseHouse requested conference committee
2019-02-21HouseHouse insisted on amendment
2019-02-21SenateHouse amendment rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N)
2019-02-20HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HousePassed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2019-02-20HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-20HouseRead third time
2019-02-19HouseRead second time
2019-02-18HouseReported from Courts of Justice with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2019-02-08HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-02-04HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-04HouseRead first time
2019-02-04HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-29SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28SenateRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N)
2019-01-23SenateReported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-09SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-09SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102920D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
801379.2:1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1619
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1619+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1619S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1619ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0732+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0127+SB1619
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0196SB1619+SB1619
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0221SB1619+SB1619
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0802V0079+SB1619
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0366+SB1619
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3135+SB1619
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0946SB1619+SB1619
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0998SB1619+SB1619
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1114SB1619+SB1619
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3350+SB1619

Bill Comments

feedback