VA SB1691 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0311)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Charter; Town of Dumfries. Amends the charter for the Town of Dumfries by (i) providing that town council elections shall be held in November rather than May, (ii) altering the date of budget submittal and providing for a midyear budget review, and (iii) making technical changes, including a clarification in the boundary description. This bill is identical to HB 2670.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dumfries, Town of; amending charter, town council elections, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0311)
2019-03-08 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 311 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-23HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-23SenateSigned by President
2019-02-23SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1691ER)
2019-02-23SenateEnrolled
2019-02-20SenateTitle replaced 19106972D-H1
2019-02-20SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseReconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1691H1
2019-02-19HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106972D-H1
2019-02-19HouseRead third time
2019-02-18HouseRead second time
2019-02-15HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106972D-H1
2019-02-15HouseReported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06HouseAssigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-30HouseReferred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
2019-01-30HouseRead first time
2019-01-30HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-28SenateRead third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25SenateRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-24SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-22SenateReported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N)
2019-01-14SenateReferred to Committee on Local Government
2019-01-14SenatePresented and ordered printed 19104484D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1691
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1691+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1691H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1691ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0311+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S07V0028+SB1691
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0172SB1691+SB1691
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0201SB1691+SB1691
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0701V0040+SB1691
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H07V0083+SB1691
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2962+SB1691
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3005+SB1691
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0883SB1691+SB1691

Bill Comments

feedback