VA SB1692 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0654)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Industrial hemp; federal Farm Bill; emergency. Conforms Virginia law to the provisions of the federal 2018 Farm Bill by amending the definitions of cannabidiol oil, marijuana, and tetrahydrocannabinol (THC) to exclude industrial hemp in the possession of a registered person, hemp products, or an oil containing no more than 0.3% THC. The bill defines "industrial hemp" as any part of the plant Cannabis sativa that has a concentration of THC that is no greater than that allowed by federal law, and it defines "hemp product" as any finished product that is otherwise lawful and that contains industrial hemp. The bill it adds the category of "dealer" in industrial hemp to the existing registration categories of grower and processor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Industrial hemp; federal Farm Bill.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0654)
2019-03-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 654 (effective 3/21/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1692ER)
2019-02-22SenateEnrolled
2019-02-19SenateTitle replaced 19106765D-H1
2019-02-19SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-15HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (95-Y 0-N)
2019-02-15HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N)
2019-02-15HouseReconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
2019-02-15HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (94-Y 0-N)
2019-02-15HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1692H1
2019-02-15HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106765D-H1
2019-02-15HouseRead third time
2019-02-15HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14HouseRead second time
2019-02-13HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106765D-H1
2019-02-13HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2019-02-04HouseRead first time
2019-02-04HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-30SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1692S1
2019-01-29SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19105767D-S1
2019-01-29SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-01-29SenateRead second time
2019-01-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24SenateCommittee substitute printed 19105767D-S1
2019-01-24SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-14SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2019-01-14SenatePresented and ordered printed with emergency clause 19104500D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182247(n/a)See Bill Text
324112(n/a)See Bill Text
324113(n/a)See Bill Text
324114(n/a)See Bill Text
324114.1(n/a)See Bill Text
324114.2(n/a)See Bill Text
324115(n/a)See Bill Text
324116(n/a)See Bill Text
324117(n/a)See Bill Text
324118(n/a)See Bill Text
324119(n/a)See Bill Text
5413401(n/a)See Bill Text
5413408.3(n/a)See Bill Text
5413446(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1692
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1692+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1692S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1692H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1692ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0654+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S01V0039+SB1692
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0215SB1692+SB1692
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0243SB1692+SB1692
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H01V0089+SB1692
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2850+SB1692
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2862+SB1692
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0804SB1692+SB1692

Bill Comments

feedback