VA SB170 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-11 - Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (SB188-Herring) (11-Y 0-N)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-11 - Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (SB188-Herring) (11-Y 0-N)
Summary
Custody and visitation; modification based on active military duty. Provides that a court cannot modify a custody or visitation order when one parent is on active military duty; however, a court may enter a temporary order modifying the prior custody or visitation order if it is in the best interests of the child. Any such temporary order expires upon the termination of the parent's active military duty, and the prior order is reinstated. Any such temporary order may also include a delegation of the visitation rights of a parent on active military duty to another person with a legitimate interest. This bill has been incorporated into
Title
Custody and visitation orders; modification based on active military duty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-02-11 | Senate: Incorporated by Courts of Justice (SB188-Herring) (11-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-10 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2008-01-07 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-07 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 087776204 |
Same As/Similar To
SB188 (Similar To) 2010-01-28 - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB170 |