VA SB1727 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0102)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Purchase, possession, and sale of tobacco products, nicotine vapor products, and alternative nicotine products; minimum age requirements; penalties. Increases the minimum age for persons prohibited from purchasing or possessing tobacco products, nicotine vapor products, and alternative nicotine products, and the minimum age for persons such products can be sold to, from 18 years of age to 21 years of age with an exception for active duty military personnel. The bill also allows tobacco products, nicotine vapor products, and alternative nicotine products to be sold from a vending machine if there is posted notice of the minimum age requirements and the machine is located in a place that is not open to the general public and not generally accessible to persons under 21 years of age. Under current law, tobacco products may be sold from a vending machine if there is posted notice of the minimum age requirements and the machine is located in a place that is not open to the general public and not generally accessible to minors. This bill is identical to HB 2748.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tobacco products, nicotine vapor products, etc.; purchase, possession, and sale.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (32-Y 6-N) (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (66-Y 30-N 1-A) (Y: 66 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (65-Y 33-N 1-A) (Y: 65 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 8-N) (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0102)
2019-02-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 102 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-14 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Midnight, February 21, 2019
2019-02-14SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 14, 2019
2019-02-14SenateSigned by President
2019-02-14HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-14SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1727ER)
2019-02-14SenateEnrolled
2019-02-13SenateHouse amendment agreed to by Senate (32-Y 6-N)
2019-02-11HouseVOTE: PASSAGE #2 (66-Y 30-N 1-A)
2019-02-11HousePassed House with amendment (66-Y 30-N 1-A)
2019-02-11HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2019-02-11HouseAmendment by Delegate Stolle agreed to
2019-02-11HouseReconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
2019-02-11HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (65-Y 33-N 1-A)
2019-02-11HousePassed House (65-Y 33-N 1-A)
2019-02-11HouseCommittee substitute rejected 19106446D-H1
2019-02-11HouseRead third time
2019-02-08HouseRead second time
2019-02-06HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106446D-H1
2019-02-06HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (9-Y 6-N)
2019-02-04HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-04HouseRead first time
2019-02-04HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-29SenateRead third time and passed Senate (32-Y 8-N)
2019-01-28SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1727S1
2019-01-28SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19105440D-S1
2019-01-28SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-01-28SenateRead second time
2019-01-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N)
2019-01-23SenateCommittee substitute printed 19105440D-S1
2019-01-23SenateReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 1-N)
2019-01-16SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-16SenatePresented and ordered printed 19104630D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182246.10(n/a)See Bill Text
182246.8(n/a)See Bill Text
182371.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1727
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1727+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1727S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1727H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1727ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0102+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0138+SB1727
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0196SB1727+SB1727
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0237SB1727+SB1727
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0324+SB1727
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2661+SB1727
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2662+SB1727
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0544SB1727+SB1727

Bill Comments

feedback