VA SB198 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0209)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0209)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Carrying concealed weapons; exceptions. Adds any employee with internal investigations authority designated by the Department of Corrections pursuant to subdivision 11 of § 53.1-10 of the Code of Virginia retired from the Department of Corrections to listed individuals who may carry a concealed handgun, provided that he carries written proof of the need to carry.
Title
Concealed weapons; adds any employee with internal investigations authority designated by DOC.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0209) | |
2016-03-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 209 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 3, 2016 | |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/25/16 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB198ER) |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-02-23 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (100-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-23 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-23 | House | Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House |
2016-02-23 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-23 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-23 | House | Read third time |
2016-02-22 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-19 | House | Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-12 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: #1 |
2016-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2016-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-04 | Senate | Introduced bill reprinted 16100642D |
2016-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-01-04 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100642D |