VA SB201 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0667)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0667)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alert for missing or endangered children; Virginia Critical Operation for a Disappeared Child Initiative (Codi) Alert Program. Creates a program for local, regional, or statewide notification of a missing or endangered child. The bill defines a missing or endangered child as a child (i) who is 17 years of age or younger or is currently enrolled in a secondary school in the Commonwealth, regardless of age; (ii) whose whereabouts are unknown; and (iii) whose disappearance is under suspicious circumstances or poses a credible threat as determined by law enforcement to the safety and health of the child and under such other circumstances as deemed appropriate by the Virginia State Police. The bill requires the Virginia State Police to develop, in consultation with representatives of local law-enforcement agencies, including representatives from the Virginia Sheriffs' Association and the Virginia Association of Chiefs of Police, policies for the establishment of uniform standards for the creation of Codi Alert Programs throughout the Commonwealth.
Title
Virginia Critical Operation for a Disappeared Child Initiative (Codi) Alert Program; established.
Sponsors
Sen. Danny Diggs [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0667) | |
2024-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 667 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-04 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB201ER) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-02-28 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-28 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-28 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-27 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-23 | House | Reported from Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2024-02-16 | House | Referred from Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N) |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 24101781D-E |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB201E |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-15 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (14-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Moved from Judiciary to Courts of Justice due to a change of the committee name |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101781D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1169 (Similar To) 2024-02-13 - Left in Public Safety
HB1388 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0658)
HB1388 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0658)