VA SB205 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-10 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-10 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Collection of forensic evidence; consent. Allows the collection of forensic evidence in cases of suspected sexual assault where the alleged victim may not be legally capable of giving consent.
Title
Forensic evidence; delay in collecting for sexual assault cases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-10 | House: Left in Courts of Justice | |
2012-02-29 | House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely by voice vote | |
2012-02-28 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal | |
2012-02-23 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-02-23 | House: Referred from Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote | |
2012-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-01-24 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 12101605D-E | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB205E | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-01-20 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-19 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-17 | Senate: Assigned Education sub: Health Care | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101605D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 2 | 1104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2969 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2982 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1520 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |