VA SB218 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0660)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0660)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Transient occupancy tax; Fairfax County limitations. Provides that any new transient occupancy tax or any increase in the rate of an existing transient occupancy tax in Fairfax County does not apply within the limits of any town located in Fairfax County, unless the governing body of the town consents. Under current law, in addition to the general two percent transient occupancy tax all counties may levy, Fairfax County may impose an additional transient occupancy tax not to exceed two percent.
Title
Transient occupancy tax; governing body may increase in Fairfax County after July 1, 2010.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (89-Y 9-N) (Y: 91 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0660) | |
2010-04-12 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 660 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB218ER) | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-02-25 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (89-Y 9-N) | |
2010-02-25 | House: Passed House (89-Y 9-N) | |
2010-02-25 | House: Read third time | |
2010-02-24 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2010-02-23 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-22 | House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-17 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | House: Assigned Finance sub: #1 | |
2010-02-03 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2010-02-03 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-03 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-22 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 10103375D-E | |
2010-01-22 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB218E | |
2010-01-22 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2010-01-22 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2010-01-22 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-01-21 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-20 | Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103375D |