VA SB227 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0814)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0814)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Certain service districts; allocation of revenues. Allows a town located within a stormwater service district to retain any revenues collected by the service district within the town, so long as the town maintains its own MS4 permit.
Title
Stormwater service district; allocation of revenues.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0814) | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 814 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-04-18 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Reenrolled bill text (SB227ER2) | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2012-04-18 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (94-Y 0-N) | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 1-N) | |
2012-04-17 | Senate: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-04-09 | Senate: Governor's recommendation received by Senate | |
2012-03-05 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-02 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB227ER) | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2012-02-28 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-28 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-28 | House: Read third time | |
2012-02-27 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-24 | House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-23 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-20 | House: Assigned CC & T sub: #2 | |
2012-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-01-23 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-20 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-01-19 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-17 | Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101900D |