VA SB233 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0225)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0225)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance licensing and registration renewal. Makes changes related to renewal of insurance agents' licensure and registration. In 2019, legislation was enacted that becomes effective January 1, 2021, to change the licensing and registration renewal cycles for agents, public adjusters, and others to a new cycle based on both month and year, with biennial renewal. The bill removes references in the current law to biennial renewal, removes a requirement in the law as it will become effective that limited lines agents renew their licenses before May 1, 2021, and adds a requirement in the law as it will become effective that certain settlement agents renew their registrations before May 1, 2021.
Title
Insurance agents; licensing and registration renewal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0225) | |
2020-03-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 225 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-03 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 10, 2020 | |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 3, 2020 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB233ER) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-21 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-18 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce (21-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2020-01-02 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101598D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 2 | 1845.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 1845.8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 1845.9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 1888 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
55 | 1 | 1014 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |