VA SB236 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-10 - House: Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-10 - House: Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Public Procurement Act; multiple project contracts for architectural or professional engineering services relating to construction. Raises, for certain local public bodies, the maximum cost of all projects in one contract term of a multiple project contract from $500,000 to $1.5 million, and raises the maximum cost for any single project from $100,000 to $500,000 for airports and aviation transportation projects. For a locality or authority or sanitation district with a population in excess of 80,000, the bill raises the maximum cost from $1 million to $2 million.
Title
Virginia Public Procurement Act; multiple project contracts for services relating to construction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee amendments reconsidered (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee amendments reconsidered (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-10 | House: Left in General Laws | |
2012-02-28 | House: Subcommittee recommends no action by voice vote | |
2012-02-20 | House: Assigned GL sub: #2 FOIA/Procurement | |
2012-02-16 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2012-02-16 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-16 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB236S1 | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 12105416D-S1 | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12105416D-S1 | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-03 | Senate: Recommitted to General Laws and Technology | |
2012-02-03 | Senate: Motion to recommit to committee agreed to | |
2012-02-03 | Senate: Committee amendments rejected | |
2012-02-03 | Senate: Committee amendments reconsidered (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-03 | Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (37-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 12101329D-E | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB236E | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-02-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (14-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101329D |