VA SB247 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0807)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0807)
Summary
Commitment of minors; appointment of counsel and guardians ad litem. Provides that a court shall appoint a guardian ad litem and counsel for a minor for involuntary commitment hearings and proceedings for the judicial approval of the admission for inpatient treatment of a minor 14 years of age or older over his objections.
Title
Involuntary commitment of minors; appointment of counsel and guardians ad litem.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0807) | |
2008-04-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 807 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-11 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB247ER) | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-03-05 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Read third time | |
2008-03-04 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-29 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-14 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Mental Health | |
2008-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2008-02-07 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-06 | Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-28 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2008-01-28 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 1-N) | |
2008-01-21 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Special on Proposed Mental Health Legislation | |
2008-01-08 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-08 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 084536248 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB247 |